Dallas National Bank

Texas – Dallas – Dallas

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

34322

1997

FDIC Certificate Number: 34322
FDIC's unique number: 57081
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Dallas

Federal Reserve ID Number: 2532961
Report Date: 2008-03-31

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 23143
The date of the last data update: 2008-06-26

1997-01-30 Institution established. Original name: Dallas National Bank.
2008-06-06 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The American National Bank of Texas in Terrell, Texas.

Total assets: $98,090,000
Total deposits: $74,735,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Dallas National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Dallas National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Dallas National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-464

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.