Deposit Bank & Trust Co.

Kentucky – Green – Greensburg

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

10512

1890

FDIC Certificate Number: 10512
FDIC's unique number: 6730
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Elizabethtown

Federal Reserve ID Number: 517348
Report Date: 2007-09-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2008-01-08

1890-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Greensburg Deposit Bank.
1987-10-20 Reorganized.
1988-02-12 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1988-02-24 Changed name to Greensburg Deposit Bank & Trust Co. .
2003-09-01 Changed name to Deposit Bank & Trust Co. .
2007-12-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of FORCHT BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION in Lexington, Kentucky.

Total assets: $105,423,000
Total deposits: $82,660,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Deposit Bank & Trust Co. does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Deposit Bank & Trust Co., we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Deposit Bank & Trust Co. will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-407

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.