East Girard Savings Association

Pennsylvania – Philadelphia – Philadelphia

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

29633

1922

FDIC Certificate Number: 29633
FDIC's unique number: 42467
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Philadelphia

Federal Reserve ID Number: 337779
Report Date: 1982-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1998-07-17

1922-01-01 Institution established. Original name: East Girard Savings Association.
1979-12-31 Acquired Century Savings Association in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.
1980-07-31 Acquired Key Savings And Loan Association in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.
1982-05-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Atlantic Financial Federal in Bala Cynwyd, Pennsylvania.
1982-06-30 Acquired West Penn Federal Savings And Loan Association in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania.
1982-08-31 Acquired Centennial Federal Savings And Loan Association in Nazareth, Pennsylvania.
1982-08-31 Acquired Susquehanna Savings Association in Wilkes-barre, Pennsylvania.
1982-09-30 Acquired Pioneer Savings And Loan Association Of Bloomfield in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania.
1983-02-28 Acquired Metropolitan Federal Savings And Loan Association Of Eastern Pennsylvani in Bala Cynwyd, Pennsylvania.
1983-07-31 Acquired Provident Savings Association in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.
1984-02-29 Changed organization type to Stock Savings & Loan.
1984-09-30 Acquired West End Federal Savings And Loan Association in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania.
1988-03-31 Acquired Uniontown Savings And Loan Association in Uniontown, Pennsylvania.
1990-01-11 Failed, went into receivership, and then became Atlantic Financial Savings, F.A. in Bala Cynwyd, Pennsylvania.
1991-11-15 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Fidelity Bank, National Association in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.
1993-06-18 Changed name to First Fidelity Bank, National Association, Pennsylvania .
1993-06-18 Acquired Merchants Bank in Wilkes-barre, Pennsylvania.
1993-06-18 Acquired Merchants Bank, National Association in Allentown, Pennsylvania.
1994-01-11 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Fidelity Bank, National Association in Salem, New Jersey.
1994-01-11 Moved bank headquarters from Philadelphia, Pennsylvania to Salem, New Jersey.
1994-03-25 Acquired First Peoples National Bank in Edwardsville, Pennsylvania.
1994-10-20 Acquired First Fidelity Bank, National Association in Newark, New Jersey.
1994-11-08 Moved bank headquarters from Salem, New Jersey to Elkton, Maryland.
1994-11-29 Acquired The Bank Of Baltimore in Baltimore, Maryland.
1994-12-30 Acquired First Fidelity Bank, Fsb in Beltsville, Maryland.
1996-01-01 Changed name to First Union National Bank .
1996-07-11 Moved bank headquarters from Elkton, Maryland to Avondale, Pennsylvania.
1998-01-16 Acquired Covenant Bank in Haddonfield, New Jersey.
1998-02-26 Moved bank headquarters from Avondale, Pennsylvania to Charlotte, North Carolina.
1998-02-26 Acquired First Union National Bank in Charlotte, North Carolina.
1998-02-27 Acquired Signet Trust Company in Richmond, Virginia.
1998-05-15 Acquired Corestates Bank, National Association in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.
1998-08-13 Acquired Mentor Trust Company in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.
1998-08-13 Acquired Mentor Trust Company in Richmond, Virginia.
1999-07-16 Acquired Keystone Trust Company in Portsmouth, New Hampshire.
1999-12-01 Acquired Meridian Trust Company in Reading, Pennsylvania.
2002-04-01 Changed name to Wachovia Bank, National Association .
2002-04-01 Acquired Wachovia Bank, National Association in Winston-salem, North Carolina.
2002-12-31 Acquired The First National Bank Of Atlanta in New Castle, Delaware.
2002-12-31 Acquired Offitbank in New York City, New York.
2003-11-06 Acquired Atlantic Savings Bank, F.S.B. in Hilton Head Island, South Carolina.
2004-12-01 Acquired First Union Direct Bank, National Association in Augusta, Georgia.
2005-01-03 Acquired Southtrust Bank in Birmingham, Alabama.
2006-03-01 Acquired Western Financial Bank, National Association in Irvine, California.
2007-10-12 Acquired World Savings Bank Interim, National Association in Oceanside, New York.
2008-06-01 Acquired A.g. Edwards Trust Company, Fsb in St. Louis, Missouri.
2010-03-20 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association in Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
2010-04-10 Acquired Wachovia Card Services, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2010-05-10 Acquired Wells Fargo Hsbc Trade Bank, National Association in San Francisco, California.
2010-11-01 Acquired Wells Fargo Alaska Trust Company, National Association in Anchorage, Alaska.
2011-03-31 Acquired Wells Fargo Central Bank in Calabasas, California.

Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

East Girard Savings Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with East Girard Savings Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and East Girard Savings Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-15818

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.