East Penn Bank

Pennsylvania – Lehigh – Emmaus

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

33526

1991

FDIC Certificate Number: 33526
FDIC's unique number: 47365
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Philadelphia

Federal Reserve ID Number: 1901243
Report Date: 2007-09-30

Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 2007-11-29

1991-11-01 Institution established. Original name: East Penn Bank.
2007-11-16 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Harleysville National Bank and Trust Company in Harleysville, Pennsylvania.
2008-12-06 Acquired Willow Financial Bank in Wayne, Pennsylvania.
2010-04-09 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Niagara Bank, National Association in Buffalo, New York.
2011-04-15 Acquired Newalliance Bank in New Haven, Connecticut.

Total assets: $436,869,000
Total deposits: $372,966,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

East Penn Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with East Penn Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and East Penn Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-299

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.