Empire Sband Loan Association

Colorado – Denver – Denver

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

28409

1931

FDIC Certificate Number: 28409
FDIC's unique number: 41243
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Denver

Federal Reserve ID Number: 342577
Report Date: 1987-03-31

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1998-12-10

1931-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Empire Sband Loan Association.
1984-05-31 Acquired Mesa Verde Savings And Loan Association in Cortez, Colorado.
1987-05-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Commercial Federal Savings and Loan Association in Omaha, Nebraska.
1990-08-27 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1990-08-27 Changed name to Commercial Federal Bank, A Federal Savings Bank .
1990-08-27 Moved bank headquarters from Denver, Colorado to Omaha, Nebraska.
1993-10-09 Acquired Heartland Federal Savings And Loan Association in Ponca City, Oklahoma.
1994-06-10 Acquired Franklin Federal Savings Association in Ottawa, Kansas as part of a government assisted transaction.
1994-07-19 Acquired Home Federal Savings And Loan Association Of Ada in Ada, Oklahoma.
1995-04-04 Acquired Provident Fsb in Lincoln, Nebraska.
1995-10-02 Acquired Railroad Savings Bank, F.S.B. in Wichita, Kansas.
1996-02-01 Acquired Conservative Savings Bank, F.S.B. in Omaha, Nebraska.
1996-10-01 Acquired Hawkeye Federal Savings Bank in Boone, Iowa.
1997-05-01 Acquired Investors Federal Savings in Kinsley, Kansas.
1998-01-30 Acquired First United National Bank And Trust Company in Great Bend, Kansas.
1998-02-13 Acquired Liberty Bank And Trust, National Association in Pocahontas, Iowa.
1998-02-13 Acquired Liberty Bank & Trust in Lake Mills, Iowa.
1998-02-13 Acquired Liberty Bank & Trust in Mason City, Iowa.
1998-02-13 Acquired Liberty Bank & Trust in Bloomfield, Iowa.
1998-02-13 Acquired Liberty Bank & Trust in Woodbine, Iowa.
1998-02-13 Acquired Liberty Bank And Trust in Forest City, Iowa.
1998-02-13 Acquired Liberty Bank And Trust in Johnston, Iowa.
1998-02-13 Acquired Liberty Bank & Trust in Tucson, Arizona.
1998-02-27 Acquired Mid-continent Federal Savings Bank in El Dorado, Kansas.
1998-05-30 Acquired Perpetual Savings Bank, Fsb in Cedar Rapids, Iowa.
1998-07-31 Acquired Amerus Bank in Des Moines, Iowa.
1998-08-14 Acquired First Federal Bank Of Colorado in Lakewood, Colorado.
1999-03-02 Acquired Midland Bank in Lee's Summit, Missouri.
2005-12-03 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of the West in San Francisco, California.

Total assets: $2,052,664,000
Total deposits: $1,424,508,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Empire Sband Loan Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Empire Sband Loan Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Empire Sband Loan Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-446

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.