Eureka Savings Bank

Illinois – La Salle – La Salle

(SB) Savings banks, state charter

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SB) Savings banks, state charter

active

28401

1885

FDIC Certificate Number: 28401
FDIC's unique number: 41235
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Princeton

Federal Reserve ID Number: 587677
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SB

Number of Domestic Offices: 4
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03

1885-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Eureka Savings And Loan Association Of La Salle.
1989-01-31 Acquired Mendota Savings And Loan Association in Mendota, Illinois.
1992-07-08 Changed name to Eureka Savings Bank .
1992-07-08 Changed organization type to Mutual Savings Bank.

Total assets: $400,426,000
Total deposits: $331,533,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $331,533,000
Equity capital: $68,447,000

Net income: $305,000

Return on Assets: 0.15
Return on Equity: 0.89
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Eureka Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Eureka Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Eureka Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-450

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.