F & M Bank and Trust Company

Georgia – Meriwether – Manchester

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

16916

1948

FDIC Certificate Number: 16916
FDIC's unique number: 11000
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Atlanta

Federal Reserve ID Number: 937834
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM

Number of Domestic Offices: 2
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03

1948-02-02 Institution established. Original name: F & M Bank And Trust Company.
1975-12-31 Changed name to F & M Bank And Trust Company .
1976-03-26 Changed trust powers from Full Trust Powers Granted to Limited Trust Powers Granted.

Total assets: $101,813,000
Total deposits: $88,967,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $88,967,000
Equity capital: $8,722,000

Net income: $-420,000

Return on Assets: -0.79
Return on Equity: -9.45
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: F & M Holding Company, Inc.

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

F & M Bank and Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with F & M Bank and Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and F & M Bank and Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-390

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.