Farmers Bank, a Federal Savings Bank

Maryland – Baltimore (city) – Baltimore

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

32581

1892

FDIC Certificate Number: 32581
FDIC's unique number: 45415
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Baltimore

Federal Reserve ID Number: 307772
Report Date: 1995-03-31

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1996-01-31

1892-05-12 Institution established. Original name: Monumental Savings And Loan Association.
1988-12-31 Changed name to Monumental Savings Bank, Fsb .
1988-12-31 Changed organization type to Mutual Savings Bank.
1991-04-30 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1991-05-01 Changed name to Farmers Bank, A Federal Savings Bank .
1995-05-22 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Mariner Bank in Baltimore, Maryland.

Total assets: $12,263,000
Total deposits: $9,959,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Farmers Bank, a Federal Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Farmers Bank, a Federal Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Farmers Bank, a Federal Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-494

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.