Farmers Deposit Bank of Middleburg, Inc.

Kentucky – Casey – Middleburg

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

10514

1904

FDIC Certificate Number: 10514
FDIC's unique number: 6732
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Lexington

Federal Reserve ID Number: 449841
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM

Number of Domestic Offices: 2
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2010-03-26

1904-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Farmers Deposit Bank.
1973-02-23 Changed trust powers from Full Trust Powers Granted to Limited Trust Powers Granted.
1991-11-13 Changed name to Farmers Deposit Bank Of Middleburg, Inc. .
1997-09-25 Acquired Lincoln Federal Savings Bank in Liberty, Kentucky.

Total assets: $47,355,000
Total deposits: $37,675,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $37,675,000
Equity capital: $5,947,000

Net income: $-131,000

Return on Assets: -0.55
Return on Equity: -4.35
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: John R Turner Holding Company

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Farmers Deposit Bank of Middleburg, Inc. does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Farmers Deposit Bank of Middleburg, Inc., we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Farmers Deposit Bank of Middleburg, Inc. will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-413

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.