Farmers State Bank of West Concord

Minnesota – Dodge – West Concord

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

active

8865

1930

FDIC Certificate Number: 8865
FDIC's unique number: 5659
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Minneapolis

Federal Reserve ID Number: 777254
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SM

Number of Domestic Offices: 2
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03

1930-06-02 Institution established. Original name: Farmers State Bank Of West Concord.
1987-03-05 Acquired First National Bank In West Concord in West Concord, Minnesota.

Total assets: $47,413,000
Total deposits: $42,896,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $42,896,000
Equity capital: $3,984,000

Net income: $152,000

Return on Assets: 0.65
Return on Equity: 7.97
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: West Concord Bancshares, Inc.

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Farmers State Bank of West Concord does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Farmers State Bank of West Concord, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Farmers State Bank of West Concord will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-418

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.