Federal Trust Bank

Florida – Seminole – Sanford

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

active

32580

1988

FDIC Certificate Number: 32580
FDIC's unique number: 45414
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Tampa

Federal Reserve ID Number: 1189984
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
OCC Charter Number: 708E3

Number of Domestic Offices: 11
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-07-21

1988-05-03 Institution established. Original name: First Coast Savings Bank, Fsb.
1990-07-27 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1990-07-27 Changed name to Federal Trust Bank, A Federal Savings Bank .
1992-04-03 Acquired First Federal Savings And Loan Association Of Seminole County, F.A. in Sanford, Florida.
1993-07-22 Moved bank headquarters from Amelia Island, Florida to Winter Park, Florida.
1993-09-10 Changed name to Federal Trust Bank .
1997-12-04 Changed trust powers from Full Trust Powers Granted to Trust Powers Terminated.
2002-06-21 Moved bank headquarters from Winter Park, Florida to Sanford, Florida.
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.

Total assets: $338,403,000
Total deposits: $225,429,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $225,429,000
Equity capital: $85,398,000

Net income: $-8,766,000

Return on Assets: -5
Return on Equity: -19.25
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Federal Trust Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Federal Trust Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Federal Trust Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-495

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.