Fidelity Savings-Austin, FA

Texas – Travis – Austin

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

32223

1984

FDIC Certificate Number: 32223
FDIC's unique number: 45057
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Austin

Federal Reserve ID Number: 962377
Report Date: 1991-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1991-11-21

1984-06-11 Institution established. Original name: Fidelity Savings-austin, FA.
1991-07-12 Failed, went into receivership, and then became Fidelity Federal Savings and Loan Association in Austin, Texas.
1992-02-07 Ceased operations as a result of a government supervised payoff, liquidation or closing. No active institution received any of deposits.
1992-02-07 Government conservatorship or bridge bank resolved.

Total assets: $67,044,000
Total deposits: $56,885,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Fidelity Savings-Austin, FA does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Fidelity Savings-Austin, FA, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Fidelity Savings-Austin, FA will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-178

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.