Financial Federal Savings Bank

New York – Queens – Sunnyside

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

30335

1947

FDIC Certificate Number: 30335
FDIC's unique number: 43169
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: New York City

Federal Reserve ID Number: 119470
Report Date: 1998-12-31

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1999-03-18

1947-12-26 Institution established. Original name: Financial Federal Savings And Loan Association.
1994-08-17 Changed organization type to Stock Savings & Loan.
1994-10-20 Changed name to Financial Federal Savings Bank .
1994-10-20 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1999-01-22 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Dime Savings Bank of Williamsburgh in New York City, New York.
2002-01-22 Changed name to The Dime Svgs. Bank Of Williamsburgh .
2002-01-22 Moved bank headquarters from Long Island City, New York to Brooklyn, New York.
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.

Total assets: $311,285,000
Total deposits: $233,633,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Financial Federal Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Financial Federal Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Financial Federal Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-241

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.