First American Bank

Georgia – Meriwether – Warm Springs

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

8032

1906

FDIC Certificate Number: 8032
FDIC's unique number: 5113
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Atlanta

Federal Reserve ID Number: 899530
Report Date: 1986-09-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1995-06-09

1906-08-03 Institution established. Original name: First American Bank.
1971-07-29 Moved bank headquarters from Luthersville, Georgia to Warm Springs, Georgia.
1986-11-14 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of Coweta in Newnan, Georgia.
2010-06-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Synovus Bank in Columbus, Georgia.
2010-06-30 Acquired The Bank Of Nashville in Nashville, Tennessee.
2010-06-30 Acquired Trust One Bank in Memphis, Tennessee.

Total assets: $12,449,000
Total deposits: $11,338,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First American Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First American Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First American Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-311

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.