First American Federal Savings and Loan Association

Alabama – Madison – Huntsville

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

29359

1926

FDIC Certificate Number: 29359
FDIC's unique number: 42193
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Shelby

Federal Reserve ID Number: 154873
Report Date: 1993-09-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1994-02-10

1926-01-01 Institution established. Original name: First American Federal Savings And Loan Association.
1982-05-31 Acquired First Federal Savings And Loan Association in Scottsboro, Alabama.
1984-09-30 Changed organization type to Stock Savings & Loan.
1989-10-31 Acquired Fayetteville First Federal Savings And Loan Association in Fayetteville, Tennessee.
1992-07-11 Acquired First Federal Savings And Loan Association Of Giles Co in Pulaski, Tennessee.
1993-12-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Colonial Bank in Montgomery, Alabama.
1995-04-01 Acquired Brundidge Banking Company, Inc. in Brundidge, Alabama.
1995-11-04 Acquired Farmers And Merchants Bank in Ariton, Alabama.
1996-07-08 Acquired Dothan Federal Savings Bank in Dothan, Alabama.
1997-04-03 Acquired The Union Bank in Evergreen, Alabama.
1997-06-13 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Federal Reserve Board.
1997-06-16 Acquired Colonial Bank in Lawrenceville, Georgia.
1997-06-16 Acquired Colonial Bank Of Tennessee in Ardmore, Tennessee.
1997-07-01 Acquired First Commerce Bank Of Polk County in Winter Haven, Florida.
1997-07-01 Acquired Colonial Bank in Orlando, Florida.
1997-07-01 Acquired Great Southern Bank in West Palm Beach, Florida.
1997-09-16 Acquired Dadeland Bank in Miami, Florida.
1997-10-02 Acquired First Independence Bank Of Florida in Fort Myers, Florida.
1998-02-06 Acquired Ashville Savings Bank in Ashville, Alabama.
1998-02-12 Acquired First Central Bank in St. Petersburg, Florida.
1998-02-13 Acquired First National Bank Of Florida At Bonita Springs in Bonita Springs, Florida.
1998-02-20 Acquired United American Bank Of Central Florida in Orlando, Florida.
1998-06-16 Acquired Commercial Bank Of Nevada in Las Vegas, Nevada.
1998-08-13 Acquired Commercial National Bank in Daytona Beach, Florida.
1998-09-18 Acquired Firstbank in Dallas, Texas.
1998-10-02 Acquired First Macon Bank & Trust Company in Macon, Georgia.
1998-10-07 Acquired Prime Bank Of Central Florida in Titusville, Florida.
1998-10-14 Acquired Interwest Bank in Fallon, Nevada.
1998-12-01 Acquired Texas Bank And Trust in Dallas, Texas.
2002-03-29 Acquired First Mercantile Bank, National Association in Dallas, Texas.
2002-10-18 Acquired Palm Beach National Bank & Trust Company in Palm Beach, Florida.
2003-08-08 Changed name to Colonial Bank, National Association .
2003-08-08 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Bank, National, Member Frs.
2003-08-08 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Reserve Board to Comptroller Of The Currency.
2003-12-04 Acquired Sarasota Bank in Sarasota, Florida.
2005-02-10 Acquired Union Bank Of Florida in Lauderhill, Florida.
2005-06-02 Acquired First Federal Savings Bank Of Lake County in Leesburg, Florida.
2007-06-08 Acquired Commercial Bank Of Florida in Miami, Florida.
2007-12-13 Acquired Citrus And Chemical Bank in Bartow, Florida.
2008-06-10 Changed name to Colonial Bank .
2008-06-10 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Not Members Of The Frs.
2008-06-10 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
2009-08-14 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Branch Banking and Trust Company in Winston Salem, North Carolina.
2009-08-14 FDIC closing information for Colonial Bank : http://www.fdic.gov/bank/individual/failed/colonial-al.html.

Total assets: $482,445,000
Total deposits: $426,355,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First American Federal Savings and Loan Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First American Federal Savings and Loan Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First American Federal Savings and Loan Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-405

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.