First Arizona Savings, A FSB

Arizona – Maricopa – Scottsdale

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

32582

1988

FDIC Certificate Number: 32582
FDIC's unique number: 45416
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Phoenix

Federal Reserve ID Number: 1198454
Report Date: 2010-09-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 2010-10-25

1988-05-18 Institution established. Original name: First Arizona Savings And Loan Association.
1990-01-26 Acquired Universal Savings And Loan Association, A Federal Savings And Loan Assoc in Scottsdale, Arizona.
1992-10-26 Moved bank headquarters from Glendale, Arizona to Scottsdale, Arizona.
1995-11-01 Changed name to First Arizona Savings, A Fsb .
1995-11-01 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1997-10-14 Moved bank headquarters from Scottsdale, Arizona to Phoenix, Arizona.
2002-12-02 Moved bank headquarters from Phoenix, Arizona to Scottsdale, Arizona.
2010-10-22 Failed. No active institution received any of its deposits or its assets.
2010-10-22 FDIC closing information for First Arizona Savings, A Fsb : http://www.fdic.gov/bank/individual/failed/firstazfsb.html.

Total assets: $255,920,000
Total deposits: $190,615,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First Arizona Savings, A FSB does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First Arizona Savings, A FSB, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Arizona Savings, A FSB will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-497

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.