First Bassett Bank & Trust

Virginia – Henry – Bassett

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

6816

1907

FDIC Certificate Number: 6816
FDIC's unique number: 4585
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Richmond

Federal Reserve ID Number: 751227
Report Date: 1984-03-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
OCC Charter Number: 11976
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1907-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The First National Bank Of Bassett.
1979-01-02 Changed name to First Bassett Bank & Trust .
1984-06-16 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Dominion Bank, National Association in Roanoke County, Virginia.
1984-10-20 Acquired Dominion Bank Of Bristol, National Association in Abingdon, Virginia.
1985-09-14 Acquired Dominion Bank Of The Cumberlands, National Association in Haysi, Virginia.
1990-12-28 Acquired Dominion Bank Of Richmond, National Association in Henrico County, Virginia.
1990-12-31 Acquired Dominion Bank Of Northern Virginia, National Association in Mclean, Virginia.
1991-03-08 Acquired Dominion Bank Of Shenandoah Valley, National Association in Bridgewater, Virginia.
1991-03-30 Acquired Dominion Bank Of Greater Hampton Roads, National Association in Norfolk, Virginia.
1993-07-22 Changed name to First Union National Bank Of Virginia .
1993-07-22 Acquired Dominion Trust Company in Roanoke, Virginia.
1993-07-22 Acquired First Union Bank Of Virginia in Vienna, Virginia.
1993-10-27 Acquired First American Bank Of Virginia in Mclean, Virginia.
1995-04-02 Acquired Ameribanc Savings Bank, Fsb in Annandale, Virginia.
1995-11-03 Acquired Columbia First Bank, A Federal Savings Bank in Arlington, Virginia.
1997-07-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Union National Bank in Charlotte, North Carolina.
1997-11-29 Acquired Signet Bank in Richmond, Virginia.
1998-02-26 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Union National Bank in Charlotte, North Carolina.
1998-02-27 Acquired Signet Trust Company in Richmond, Virginia.
1998-05-15 Acquired Corestates Bank, National Association in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.
1998-08-13 Acquired Mentor Trust Company in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.
1998-08-13 Acquired Mentor Trust Company in Richmond, Virginia.
1999-07-16 Acquired Keystone Trust Company in Portsmouth, New Hampshire.
1999-12-01 Acquired Meridian Trust Company in Reading, Pennsylvania.
2002-04-01 Changed name to Wachovia Bank, National Association .
2002-04-01 Acquired Wachovia Bank, National Association in Winston-salem, North Carolina.
2002-12-31 Acquired The First National Bank Of Atlanta in New Castle, Delaware.
2002-12-31 Acquired Offitbank in New York City, New York.
2003-11-06 Acquired Atlantic Savings Bank, F.S.B. in Hilton Head Island, South Carolina.
2004-12-01 Acquired First Union Direct Bank, National Association in Augusta, Georgia.
2005-01-03 Acquired Southtrust Bank in Birmingham, Alabama.
2006-03-01 Acquired Western Financial Bank, National Association in Irvine, California.
2007-10-12 Acquired World Savings Bank Interim, National Association in Oceanside, New York.
2008-06-01 Acquired A.g. Edwards Trust Company, Fsb in St. Louis, Missouri.
2010-03-20 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association in Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
2010-04-10 Acquired Wachovia Card Services, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2010-05-10 Acquired Wells Fargo Hsbc Trade Bank, National Association in San Francisco, California.
2010-11-01 Acquired Wells Fargo Alaska Trust Company, National Association in Anchorage, Alaska.
2011-03-31 Acquired Wells Fargo Central Bank in Calabasas, California.

Total assets: $83,171,000
Total deposits: $72,677,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First Bassett Bank & Trust does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First Bassett Bank & Trust, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Bassett Bank & Trust will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-223

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.