First Charter Bank, National Association

California – Los Angeles – Beverly Hills

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

24451

1983

FDIC Certificate Number: 24451
FDIC's unique number: 16995
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Los Angeles (West)

Federal Reserve ID Number: 606569
Report Date: 2001-09-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 17731
The date of the last data update: 2001-12-11

1983-04-06 Institution established. Original name: First Charter Bank, National Association.
1990-01-29 Moved bank headquarters from Los Angeles, California to Beverly Hills, California.
2001-10-08 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Professional Bank, National Association in Santa Monica, California.
2002-01-23 Changed name to Pacific Western National Bank .
2002-01-23 Acquired First Community Bank Of The Desert in Indian Wells, California.
2002-01-23 Acquired Pacific Western National Bank in Pico Rivera, California.
2002-08-22 Acquired Upland Bank in Upland, California.
2002-08-23 Acquired Marathon National Bank in Los Angeles, California.
2003-08-22 Acquired Verdugo Banking Company in Glendale, California.
2004-04-16 Acquired Harbor National Bank in Newport Beach, California.
2005-08-12 Acquired First American Bank in Rosemead, California.
2005-10-07 Acquired Pacific Liberty Bank in Huntington Beach, California.
2006-01-04 Acquired Cedars Bank in Los Angeles, California.
2006-05-09 Acquired Foothill Independent Bank in Glendora, California.
2006-09-13 Changed name to Pacific Western Bank .
2006-09-13 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Not Members Of The Frs.
2006-09-13 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
2006-10-26 Moved bank headquarters from Santa Monica, California to San Diego, California.
2006-10-26 Acquired First National Bank in Rancho Santa Fe, California.
2006-10-26 Acquired Community National Bank in Escondido, California.
2008-11-07 Acquired Security Pacific Bank in Los Angeles, California as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-08-28 Acquired Affinity Bank in Ventura, California as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-08-20 Acquired Los Padres Bank in Solvang, California as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-12-20 Moved bank headquarters from San Diego, California to Los Angeles, California.

Total assets: $126,983,000
Total deposits: $110,745,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First Charter Bank, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First Charter Bank, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Charter Bank, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-18507

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.