First City Bank - Almeda Genoa

Texas – Harris – Houston

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

20255

1970

FDIC Certificate Number: 20255
FDIC's unique number: 13934
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Houston

Federal Reserve ID Number: 717951
Report Date: 1988-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1970-09-17 Institution established. Original name: Almeda-genoa Bank.
1976-01-01 Changed name to First City Bank - Almeda Genoa .
1988-04-20 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
1988-09-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First City National Bank of Houston in Houston, Texas.
1988-12-15 Acquired First City National Bank Of Richmond in Richmond, Texas.
1989-03-31 Changed name to First City, Texas - Houston, National Association .
1992-10-30 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of New First City, Texas - Houston, National Association in Houston, Texas.
1993-02-13 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Texas Commerce Bank National Association in Houston, Texas.
1993-10-15 Acquired Texas Commerce Bank - Rio Grande Valley, National Association in Mcallen, Texas.
1993-11-13 Acquired Texas Commerce Bank - El Paso, National Association in El Paso, Texas.
1993-11-13 Acquired Texas Commerce Bank-odessa, National Association in Odessa, Texas.
1993-11-13 Acquired Texas Commerce Bank-midland, National Association in Midland, Texas.
1993-12-10 Acquired Texas Commerce Bank - Beaumont, National Association in Beaumont, Texas.
1993-12-10 Acquired Texas Commerce Bank-new Braunfels, National Association in New Braunfels, Texas.
1993-12-10 Acquired Texas Commerce Bank-austin, National Association in Austin, Texas.
1993-12-10 Acquired Texas Commerce Bank, National Association in Dallas, Texas.
1993-12-10 Acquired Texas Commerce Bank-san Antonio, National Association in San Antonio, Texas.
1993-12-17 Acquired Texas Commerce Trust Company, National Association in Dallas, Texas.
1994-04-14 Acquired Cullen/frost Bank Of Dallas, National Association in Dallas, Texas.
1998-01-20 Changed name to Chase Bank Of Texas, National Association .
2000-08-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Chase Manhattan Bank in New York City, New York.
2001-08-01 Acquired Chase Bank Of Texas-san Angelo, National Association in San Angelo, Texas.
2001-11-10 Changed name to Jpmorgan Chase Bank .
2001-11-10 Acquired Morgan Guaranty Trust Company Of New York in New York City, New York.
2004-11-13 Changed name to Jpmorgan Chase Bank, National Association .
2004-11-13 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Bank, National, Member Frs.
2004-11-13 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Reserve Board to Comptroller Of The Currency.
2004-11-13 Moved bank headquarters from New York City, New York to Columbus, Ohio.
2004-11-13 Acquired Bank One, National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2004-11-13 Acquired Bank One, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2006-10-20 Acquired Bank One Trust Company, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2008-08-16 Acquired J. P. Morgan Trust Company, National Association in Los Angeles, California.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank Fsb in Park City, Utah.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank in Henderson, Nevada as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $81,596,000
Total deposits: $75,373,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First City Bank - Almeda Genoa does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First City Bank - Almeda Genoa, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First City Bank - Almeda Genoa will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-92

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.