First Clover Leaf Bank, FSB

Illinois – Madison – Edwardsville

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

active

30330

1921

FDIC Certificate Number: 30330
FDIC's unique number: 43164
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Mount Vernon

Federal Reserve ID Number: 116871
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
OCC Charter Number: 705E3

Number of Domestic Offices: 4
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-07-21

1921-01-01 Institution established. Original name: First Federal Savings And Loan Association Of Edwardsville.
2001-01-02 Changed organization type to Stock Savings & Loan.
2006-07-11 Acquired Clover Leaf Bank in Edwardsville, Illinois.
2006-07-11 Changed name to First Clover Leaf Bank, Fsb .
2008-10-11 Acquired Partners Bank in Glen Carbon, Illinois.
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.

Total assets: $565,730,000
Total deposits: $439,963,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $439,963,000
Equity capital: $75,282,000

Net income: $2,083,000

Return on Assets: 0.73
Return on Equity: 5.64
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First Clover Leaf Bank, FSB does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First Clover Leaf Bank, FSB, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Clover Leaf Bank, FSB will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-244

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.