First Commercial Bank of Philadelphia

Pennsylvania – Philadelphia – Philadelphia

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

27610

1989

FDIC Certificate Number: 27610
FDIC's unique number: 40444
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Philadelphia

Federal Reserve ID Number: 1404968
Report Date: 1998-12-31

Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 1999-03-17

1989-10-24 Institution established. Original name: First Commercial Bank Of Philadelphia.
1999-02-27 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Marine Midland Bank in Buffalo, New York.
1999-03-29 Changed name to Hsbc Bank Usa .
1999-03-29 Moved bank headquarters from Philadelphia, Pennsylvania to Buffalo, New York.
1999-12-31 Acquired Republic Bank Of New York in New York City, New York.
2000-10-28 Acquired Republic Bank California National Association in Beverly Hills, California.
2004-07-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of HSBC Bank USA, National Association in New Castle, Delaware.
2004-08-25 Moved bank headquarters from Buffalo, New York to Wilmington, Delaware.
2005-03-01 Acquired Bank Of Bermuda Limited in New York City, New York.
2008-12-20 Moved bank headquarters from Wilmington, Delaware to Mc Lean, Virginia.
2008-12-20 Acquired Hsbc National Bank Usa in Bethesda, Maryland.

Total assets: $93,330,000
Total deposits: $82,451,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First Commercial Bank of Philadelphia does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First Commercial Bank of Philadelphia, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Commercial Bank of Philadelphia will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-123

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.