First Farmers Bank and Trust Company

Indiana – Miami – Converse

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

active

12839

1932

FDIC Certificate Number: 12839
FDIC's unique number: 8129
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Indianapolis

Federal Reserve ID Number: 139843
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SM

Number of Domestic Offices: 20
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2009-12-09

1932-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Union State Bank.
1990-12-03 Reorganized.
1994-12-31 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Federal Reserve Board.
1995-01-01 Acquired First Farmers National Bank in Converse, Indiana.
1995-01-01 Changed name to First Farmers Bank And Trust Company .
1995-01-01 Moved bank headquarters from Windfall, Indiana to Converse, Indiana.
2009-12-05 Acquired Central Bank in Russiaville, Indiana.

Total assets: $863,672,000
Total deposits: $703,845,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $703,845,000
Equity capital: $88,990,000

Net income: $5,566,000

Return on Assets: 1.31
Return on Equity: 12.85
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: First Farmers Financial Corporation

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First Farmers Bank and Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First Farmers Bank and Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Farmers Bank and Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-131

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.