First Federal Savings and Loan Association of Aurora

Illinois – Kane – Aurora

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

29354

1891

FDIC Certificate Number: 29354
FDIC's unique number: 42188
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Chicago

Federal Reserve ID Number: 0
Report Date: 1976-09-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1992-12-08

1891-01-01 Institution established. Original name: First Federal Savings And Loan Association Of Aurora.
1976-08-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Standard Federal Savings and Loan Association of Chicago in Chicago, Illinois.
1977-10-31 Acquired Crane Savings And Loan Association in Hickory Hills, Illinois.
1988-08-31 Acquired Capitol Federal Savings Of America in Evergreen Park, Illinois.
1989-12-21 Changed name to Standard Federal Bank For Savings .
1994-07-28 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1997-09-04 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of TCF National Bank Illinois in Burr Ridge, Illinois.
2000-04-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of TCF National Bank in Minneapolis, Minnesota.
2002-07-26 Acquired Tcf National Bank Colorado in Englewood, Colorado.
2003-04-08 Moved bank headquarters from Minneapolis, Minnesota to Wayzata, Minnesota.
2009-04-06 Moved bank headquarters from Wayzata, Minnesota to Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
2009-10-31 Acquired Tcf National Bank Arizona in Mesa, Arizona.

Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First Federal Savings and Loan Association of Aurora does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First Federal Savings and Loan Association of Aurora, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Federal Savings and Loan Association of Aurora will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-411

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.