First Federal Savings and Loan Association of Port Angeles

Washington – Clallam – Port Angeles

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

active

28405

1923

FDIC Certificate Number: 28405
FDIC's unique number: 41239
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Seattle

Federal Reserve ID Number: 403179
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
OCC Charter Number: 702E3

Number of Domestic Offices: 8
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-07-21

1923-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Lincoln Savings And Loan.
1934-10-31 Changed name to First Federal Savings And Loan Association Of Port Angeles .
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.

Total assets: $741,466,000
Total deposits: $557,123,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $557,123,000
Equity capital: $77,212,000

Net income: $1,335,000

Return on Assets: 0.36
Return on Equity: 3.51
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First Federal Savings and Loan Association of Port Angeles does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First Federal Savings and Loan Association of Port Angeles, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Federal Savings and Loan Association of Port Angeles will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-454

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.