First Federal Savings Bank

Iowa – Carroll – Carroll

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

29766

1936

FDIC Certificate Number: 29766
FDIC's unique number: 42600
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Des Moines

Federal Reserve ID Number: 477273
Report Date: 1994-12-31

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1996-01-31

1936-10-27 Institution established. Original name: First Federal Savings And Loan Association Of Carroll.
1992-05-01 Changed name to First Federal Savings Bank .
1992-05-01 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1995-03-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Hawkeye Federal Savings Bank in Boone, Iowa.
1996-10-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Commercial Federal Bank, a Federal Savings Bank in Omaha, Nebraska.
1997-05-01 Acquired Investors Federal Savings in Kinsley, Kansas.
1998-01-30 Acquired First United National Bank And Trust Company in Great Bend, Kansas.
1998-02-13 Acquired Liberty Bank And Trust, National Association in Pocahontas, Iowa.
1998-02-13 Acquired Liberty Bank & Trust in Lake Mills, Iowa.
1998-02-13 Acquired Liberty Bank & Trust in Mason City, Iowa.
1998-02-13 Acquired Liberty Bank & Trust in Bloomfield, Iowa.
1998-02-13 Acquired Liberty Bank & Trust in Woodbine, Iowa.
1998-02-13 Acquired Liberty Bank And Trust in Forest City, Iowa.
1998-02-13 Acquired Liberty Bank And Trust in Johnston, Iowa.
1998-02-13 Acquired Liberty Bank & Trust in Tucson, Arizona.
1998-02-27 Acquired Mid-continent Federal Savings Bank in El Dorado, Kansas.
1998-05-30 Acquired Perpetual Savings Bank, Fsb in Cedar Rapids, Iowa.
1998-07-31 Acquired Amerus Bank in Des Moines, Iowa.
1998-08-14 Acquired First Federal Bank Of Colorado in Lakewood, Colorado.
1999-03-02 Acquired Midland Bank in Lee's Summit, Missouri.
2005-12-03 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of the West in San Francisco, California.

Total assets: $78,217,000
Total deposits: $72,264,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First Federal Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First Federal Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Federal Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-98

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.