First Federal Savings Bank of Richmond

Kentucky – Madison – Richmond

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

28402

1923

FDIC Certificate Number: 28402
FDIC's unique number: 41236
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Lexington

Federal Reserve ID Number: 107972
Report Date: 1996-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1996-07-24

1923-01-01 Institution established. Original name: First Federal Savings And Loan Association.
1989-03-31 Changed organization type to Stock Savings & Loan.
1989-04-30 Changed name to First Federal Savings Bank Of Richmond .
1991-10-01 Acquired Estill Federal Savings Bank in Irvine, Kentucky.
1996-07-05 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Great Financial Bank, FSB in Louisville, Kentucky.
1998-02-06 Closed voluntarily and liquidated its assets.

Total assets: $136,511,000
Total deposits: $112,796,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First Federal Savings Bank of Richmond does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First Federal Savings Bank of Richmond, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Federal Savings Bank of Richmond will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-449

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.