First Financial Bank, National Association

Texas – Erath – Stephenville

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

active

34320

1997

FDIC Certificate Number: 34320
FDIC's unique number: 57079
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Dallas

Federal Reserve ID Number: 2562838
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 23147

Number of Domestic Offices: 7
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03

1997-04-03 Institution established. Original name: Liberty National Bank.
2004-11-01 Acquired Stephenville Bank And Trust Co. in Stephenville, Texas.
2004-11-01 Changed name to First Financial Bank, National Association .
2004-11-17 Moved bank headquarters from Granbury, Texas to Stephenville, Texas.
2004-12-01 Acquired First National Bank in Glen Rose, Texas.

Total assets: $342,891,000
Total deposits: $287,045,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $287,045,000
Equity capital: $45,237,000

Net income: $3,102,000

Return on Assets: 1.83
Return on Equity: 13.97
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: First Financial Bankshares, Inc.

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First Financial Bank, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First Financial Bank, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Financial Bank, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-466

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.