First Hanover Bank

North Carolina – New Hanover – Wilmington

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

26561

1986

FDIC Certificate Number: 26561
FDIC's unique number: 35260
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Raleigh

Federal Reserve ID Number: 912420
Report Date: 1991-09-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1991-10-31

1986-02-17 Institution established. Original name: First Hanover Bank.
1990-10-01 Reorganized.
1991-10-25 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Central Carolina Bank and Trust Company in Durham, North Carolina.
1995-02-04 Acquired Ccb Savings Bank Of Lenoir, Inc., SSB in Lenoir, North Carolina.
1995-05-20 Acquired Security Capital Bank in Salisbury, North Carolina.
1996-03-25 Reorganized.
1996-10-04 Acquired Graham Savings Bank, Inc., SSB in Graham, North Carolina.
1997-01-31 Acquired Salem Trust Bank in Winston Salem, North Carolina.
1999-10-02 Acquired Stone Street Bank & Trust in Mocksville, North Carolina.
2000-06-17 Acquired American Federal Bank, Fsb in Greenville, South Carolina.
2001-11-19 Acquired Southbank in Anderson, South Carolina.
2001-12-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of National Bank of Commerce in Memphis, Tennessee.
2005-04-22 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of SunTrust Bank in Atlanta, Georgia.
2008-07-25 Acquired Gainesville Bank & Trust in Gainesville, Georgia.
2008-07-25 Acquired Community Trust Bank in Hiram, Georgia.
2008-07-25 Acquired First National Bank Of The South in Milledgeville, Georgia.
2008-07-25 Acquired United Bank & Trust Company in Rockmart, Georgia.
2008-07-25 Acquired Home Town Bank Of Villa Rica in Villa Rica, Georgia.
2008-07-25 Acquired First National Bank Of Gwinnett in Duluth, Georgia.
2008-07-25 Acquired Mountain State Bank in Dawsonville, Georgia.
2008-08-01 Acquired First Priority Bank in Bradenton, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $48,212,000
Total deposits: $46,547,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First Hanover Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First Hanover Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Hanover Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-158

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.