First National Bank

Wyoming – Washakie – Worland

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

1172

1917

FDIC Certificate Number: 1172
FDIC's unique number: 804
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Billings

Federal Reserve ID Number: 562151
Report Date: 1998-03-31

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 14841
The date of the last data update: 1998-07-10

1917-01-01 Institution established. Original name: First National Bank In Worland.
1993-07-09 Acquired First National Bank At Thermopolis in Thermopolis, Wyoming.
1993-07-09 Changed name to First National Bank .
1998-06-20 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Pinnacle Bank in Cody, Wyoming.
2000-10-21 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Pinnacle Bank - Wyoming in Torrington, Wyoming.
2004-09-01 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Not Members Of The Frs.
2004-09-01 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Reserve Board to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.

Total assets: $88,652,000
Total deposits: $79,982,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-106

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.