First National Bank

Iowa – Scott – Davenport

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

active

17358

1954

FDIC Certificate Number: 17358
FDIC's unique number: 11367
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Cedar Rapids

Federal Reserve ID Number: 704447
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 14717

Number of Domestic Offices: 5
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03

1954-10-01 Institution established. Original name: Uptown National Bank Of Moline.
1993-06-01 Acquired First Bank And Trust Company in Cairo, Illinois.
1993-06-01 Changed name to Mid America Bank, National Association .
1996-08-01 Changed name to First National Bank .
1996-08-21 Moved bank headquarters from Moline, Illinois to Davenport, Iowa.

Total assets: $69,795,000
Total deposits: $60,753,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $60,753,000
Equity capital: $8,570,000

Net income: $98,000

Return on Assets: 0.28
Return on Equity: 2.31
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: Uptown Bancorporation, Inc.

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-345

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.