First National Bank

Kansas – Finney – Garden City

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

24579

1983

FDIC Certificate Number: 24579
FDIC's unique number: 17079
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Hays

Federal Reserve ID Number: 802651
Report Date: 1990-09-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 17805
The date of the last data update: 1994-08-24

1983-06-20 Institution established. Original name: The Fourth Bank Of Garden City, National Association.
1987-10-01 Acquired The First National Bank Of Meade in Meade, Kansas.
1987-10-01 Changed name to First National Bank .
1990-12-21 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Emprise Bank, National Association in Hutchinson, Kansas.
1994-05-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank IV Kansas, National Association in Wichita, Kansas.
1994-06-30 Acquired First National Bank And Trust Company In Dodge City in Dodge City, Kansas.
1995-08-18 Changed name to Bank Iv, National Association .
1995-08-18 Acquired Bank Iv Missouri, National Association in Overland Park, Kansas.
1996-10-18 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Boatmen's National Bank in Kansas City, Missouri.
1997-03-14 Changed name to Nationsbank, National Association .
1997-06-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of NationsBank, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
1997-07-11 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Of Southern Missouri in Springfield, Missouri.
1997-07-11 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of Oklahoma in Tulsa, Oklahoma.
1997-08-15 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of Arkansas in Little Rock, Arkansas.
1997-08-15 Acquired Sunwest Bank Of Albuquerque, National Association in Albuquerque, New Mexico.
1997-08-15 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of South Arkansas in Camden, Arkansas.
1997-08-15 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of Newark in Newark, Arkansas.
1997-08-15 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Iowa, National Association in Des Moines, Iowa.
1997-09-19 Acquired Boatmen's Trust Company Of Kansas in Prairie Village, Kansas.
1998-01-15 Acquired Sun World, National Association in Santa Teresa, New Mexico.
1998-01-23 Acquired Boatmen's Trust Company Of Illinois in Belleville, Illinois.
1998-03-13 Acquired Boatmen's Trust Company Of St. Louis in St. Louis, Missouri.
1998-03-13 Acquired Boatmen's Trust Company, An Oklahoma Trust Company in Oklahoma City, Oklahoma.
1998-03-28 Acquired Boatmen's Trust Company Of Arkansas in Little Rock, Arkansas.
1998-05-06 Acquired Nationsbank Of Texas, National Association in Dallas, Texas.
1998-07-09 Acquired Sunwest Bank Of El Paso, National Association in El Paso, Texas.
1998-07-09 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of Austin in Austin, Texas.
1998-08-06 Acquired Nationsbank, National Association in Brunswick, Georgia.
1998-10-08 Acquired Barnett Bank, National Association in Jacksonville, Florida.
1998-10-08 Acquired Community Bank Of The Islands in Sanibel, Florida.
1998-11-12 Acquired Nationsbank Of Tennessee, National Association in Nashville, Tennessee.
1999-04-08 Acquired Bank Of America Texas, National Association in Irving, Texas.
1999-04-08 Reorganized.
1999-07-05 Changed name to Bank Of America, National Association .
1999-07-23 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of America, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
1999-12-01 Acquired Bank Of America Utah, National Association in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2001-05-31 Acquired Nationsbank Trust Company Of New York in New York, New York.
2005-06-13 Acquired Fleet National Bank in Providence, Rhode Island.
2006-09-22 Acquired Mbna America Delaware, National Association in Wilmington, Delaware.
2008-02-22 Acquired United States Trust Company , National Association in New York, New York.
2008-06-30 Acquired Bank Of America Georgia, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank Midwest National Association in Troy, Michigan.
2009-01-16 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
2009-04-27 Acquired Countrywide Bank, Fsb in Centennial, Colorado.
2009-07-01 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank Usa in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2009-11-02 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank & Trust Co., Fsb in New York, New York.

Total assets: $37,103,000
Total deposits: $33,361,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-439

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.