First National Bank of Lake City & Creede

Colorado – Hinsdale – Lake City

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

24575

1983

FDIC Certificate Number: 24575
FDIC's unique number: 17076
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Denver

Federal Reserve ID Number: 569459
Report Date: 2007-03-31

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 17801
The date of the last data update: 2007-04-05

1983-05-16 Institution established. Original name: First National Bank Of Lake City.
1994-05-01 Changed name to First National Bank Of Lake City & Creede .
2007-04-02 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Native American Bank, National Association in Denver, Colorado.

Total assets: $33,911,000
Total deposits: $30,588,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First National Bank of Lake City & Creede does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First National Bank of Lake City & Creede, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First National Bank of Lake City & Creede will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-442

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.