First Pacific Bank

California – Los Angeles – Beverly Hills

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

20816

1972

FDIC Certificate Number: 20816
FDIC's unique number: 14380
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Los Angeles (West)

Federal Reserve ID Number: 495866
Report Date: 1990-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1972-09-28 Institution established. Original name: First Pacific Bank.
1977-10-31 Acquired First Pacific Bank in Los Angeles, California.
1977-11-01 Moved bank headquarters from Santa Monica, California to Los Angeles, California.
1981-08-31 Moved bank headquarters from Los Angeles, California to Beverly Hills, California.
1990-08-10 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of First Bank & Trust in Newport Beach, California.
1995-08-18 Changed name to First Bank & Trust .
1995-08-18 Acquired Huntington National Bank in Huntington Beach, California.
1995-08-23 Acquired Irvine City Bank, Fsb in Irvine, California.
1996-01-16 Acquired La Cumbre Savings Bank, F.S.B. in Santa Barbara, California.
1996-04-15 Acquired Queen City Bank, National Association in Long Beach, California.
1996-08-09 Moved bank headquarters from Santa Ana, California to Irvine, California.
1998-06-01 Moved bank headquarters from Irvine, California to Newport Beach, California.
1998-09-15 Acquired Republic Bank in Torrance, California.
1999-12-31 Acquired Century Bank in Beverly Hills, California.
2000-08-31 Acquired Bank Of Ventura in Ventura, California.
2000-11-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Bank & Trust in San Francisco, California.
2000-12-29 Acquired Millennium Bank in San Francisco, California.
2001-03-29 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Bank & Trust in San Francisco, California.
2001-10-16 Acquired Charter Pacific Bank in Agoura Hills, California.
2001-10-31 Acquired Byl Bank Group in Orange, California.
2003-03-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Bank in Creve Coeur, Missouri.
2004-07-30 Acquired Continental Community Bank And Trust Company in Aurora, Illinois.
2004-12-01 Acquired Cib Bank in Hillside, Illinois.
2005-04-30 Acquired First Bank Of The Americas, S.S.B. in Chicago, Illinois.
2005-09-30 Acquired International Bank Of California in Los Angeles, California.
2005-11-01 Acquired Northway State Bank in Grayslake, Illinois.
2006-01-25 Acquired First National Bank Of Sachse in Sachse, Texas.
2006-04-29 Acquired Community Bank Of Pittsfield in Pittsfield, Illinois.
2006-05-17 Acquired First Independent National Bank in Plano, Texas.
2006-08-16 Acquired San Diego Community Bank in Chula Vista, California.
2006-09-01 Acquired Oak Lawn Bank in Oak Lawn, Illinois.
2007-03-01 Acquired Royal Oaks Bank, Ssb in Houston, Texas.
2007-12-01 Acquired Coast Bank Of Florida in Bradenton, Florida.

Total assets: $118,841,000
Total deposits: $113,212,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First Pacific Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First Pacific Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Pacific Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-11530

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.