First RepublicBank Spring Branch

Texas – Harris – Houston

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

17250

1953

FDIC Certificate Number: 17250
FDIC's unique number: 11276
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Houston

Federal Reserve ID Number: 699655
Report Date: 1987-09-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1953-08-01 Institution established. Original name: Spring Branch Bank.
1981-05-20 Changed name to Republicbank Spring Branch .
1987-06-06 Changed name to First Republicbank Spring Branch .
1987-12-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First RepublicBank Houston, National Association in Houston, Texas.
1988-07-29 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of NationsBank of Texas, National Association in Dallas, Texas.
1989-08-18 Acquired Century Savings And Loan Association in Baytown, Texas.
1989-09-08 Acquired American Fsb in Austin, Texas.
1989-09-22 Acquired First Capital Savings Association Of Texas in Houston, Texas.
1989-09-22 Acquired Village Savings, Fsb in Houston, Texas.
1989-10-13 Acquired University Federal Savings Association in Houston, Texas.
1989-11-30 Acquired Greater Texas Bank Southwest, National Association in Travis County, Texas.
1990-02-01 Acquired Tyler National Bank in Tyler, Texas.
1990-03-02 Acquired Centennial Federal Savings And Loan Association in Greenville, Texas.
1990-03-16 Acquired Bankers Savings And Loan Association in Galveston, Texas.
1990-04-05 Acquired First Bank & Trust Company in Cedar Hill, Texas.
1990-04-13 Acquired Meridian Savings Association in Arlington, Texas.
1990-04-19 Acquired Chas. Schreiner Bank in Kerrville, Texas.
1990-04-27 Acquired Heritagebanc Savings Association in Duncanville, Texas.
1990-05-18 Acquired The First National Bank Of Georgetown in Georgetown, Texas.
1990-05-31 Acquired The Huntsville National Bank in Huntsville, Texas.
1990-06-01 Acquired Nbc Bank - South Texas, National Association in Corpus Christi, Texas.
1990-06-01 Acquired Nbc Bank - San Antonio, National Association in San Antonio, Texas.
1990-06-01 Acquired Nbc Bank-seguin, National Association in Seguin, Texas.
1990-06-01 Acquired Nbc Bank - Rio Grande Valley, National Association in Mission, Texas.
1990-06-01 Acquired Nbc Bank - Boerne, National Association in Boerne, Texas.
1990-06-01 Acquired Nbc Bank - Uvalde, National Association in Uvalde, Texas.
1990-06-01 Acquired Nbc Bank-houston, National Association in Houston, Texas.
1990-06-01 Acquired Nbc Bank - Austin, National Association in Austin, Texas.
1990-06-01 Acquired Nbc Bank - Kerrville, National Association in Kerrville, Texas.
1990-06-08 Acquired East Texas Savings And Loan Association, F.A. in Tyler, Texas.
1992-01-01 Changed name to Nationsbank Of Texas, National Association .
1993-02-27 Acquired Financial Resource Management Trust Company in Dallas, Texas.
1993-07-01 Acquired Westheimer National Bank in Houston, Texas.
1994-02-28 Acquired Corpus Christi National Bank in Corpus Christi, Texas.
1996-08-15 Acquired Charter National Bank - Houston in Houston, Texas.
1996-08-15 Acquired University National Bank - Galveston in Galveston, Texas.
1996-08-15 Acquired Charter National Bank-colonial in Harris County, Texas.
1997-09-19 Acquired Boatmen's Trust Company Of Texas in Houston, Texas.
1998-02-19 Acquired Boatmen's First National Bank Of Amarillo in Amarillo, Texas.
1998-05-06 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of NationsBank, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
1998-07-09 Acquired Sunwest Bank Of El Paso, National Association in El Paso, Texas.
1998-07-09 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of Austin in Austin, Texas.
1998-08-06 Acquired Nationsbank, National Association in Brunswick, Georgia.
1998-10-08 Acquired Barnett Bank, National Association in Jacksonville, Florida.
1998-10-08 Acquired Community Bank Of The Islands in Sanibel, Florida.
1998-11-12 Acquired Nationsbank Of Tennessee, National Association in Nashville, Tennessee.
1999-04-08 Acquired Bank Of America Texas, National Association in Irving, Texas.
1999-04-08 Reorganized.
1999-07-05 Changed name to Bank Of America, National Association .
1999-07-23 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of America, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
1999-12-01 Acquired Bank Of America Utah, National Association in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2001-05-31 Acquired Nationsbank Trust Company Of New York in New York, New York.
2005-06-13 Acquired Fleet National Bank in Providence, Rhode Island.
2006-09-22 Acquired Mbna America Delaware, National Association in Wilmington, Delaware.
2008-02-22 Acquired United States Trust Company , National Association in New York, New York.
2008-06-30 Acquired Bank Of America Georgia, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank Midwest National Association in Troy, Michigan.
2009-01-16 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
2009-04-27 Acquired Countrywide Bank, Fsb in Centennial, Colorado.
2009-07-01 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank Usa in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2009-11-02 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank & Trust Co., Fsb in New York, New York.

Total assets: $210,976,000
Total deposits: $194,272,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First RepublicBank Spring Branch does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First RepublicBank Spring Branch, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First RepublicBank Spring Branch will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-41

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.