First Savings and Loan Association of Central Indiana

Indiana – Madison – Anderson

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

27616

1889

FDIC Certificate Number: 27616
FDIC's unique number: 40450
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Indianapolis

Federal Reserve ID Number: 204479
Report Date: 1989-09-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1889-01-01 Institution established. Original name: First Savings And Loan Association Of Central Indiana.
1989-11-16 Failed, went into receivership, and then became First Federal Savings and Loan Association of Central Indiana in Anderson, Indiana.
1990-10-05 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Shelby Federal Savings Bank in Indianapolis, Indiana.
1991-10-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First of America Bank-Indianapolis in Speedway, Indiana.
1992-07-24 Acquired First Of America Bank-wabash Valley in Peru, Indiana.
1992-08-19 Changed name to First Of America Bank-indiana .
1995-05-05 Acquired First Of America Bank - Northwest Indiana, National Association in La Porte, Indiana.
1996-02-23 Moved bank headquarters from Speedway, Indiana to Indianapolis, Indiana.
1997-06-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First of America Bank, National Association in Kalamazoo, Michigan.
1998-10-31 Changed name to National City Bank Of Michigan/illinois .
1998-10-31 Moved bank headquarters from Indianapolis, Indiana to Bannockburn, Illinois.
1998-10-31 Moved bank headquarters from Indianapolis, Indiana to Bannockburn, Illinois.
1998-10-31 Acquired First Of America Bank-illinois, National Association in Bannockburn, Illinois.
2004-06-19 Changed name to National City Bank Of The Midwest .
2004-07-30 Acquired Allegiant Bank in Saint Louis, Missouri.
2006-07-22 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of National City Bank in Cleveland, Ohio.
2006-08-19 Acquired Pioneer Bank And Trust Company in Saint Louis, Missouri.
2007-03-17 Acquired Harbor Federal Savings Bank in Fort Pierce, Florida.
2007-04-14 Acquired Fidelity Federal Bank & Trust in West Palm Beach, Florida.
2008-02-09 Acquired Midamerica Bank, Fsb in Clarendon Hills, Illinois.
2008-12-30 Acquired New England Trust Company, National Association in Warwick, Rhode Island.
2009-09-30 Reorganized.
2009-11-06 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of PNC Bank, National Association in Wilmington, Delaware.

Total assets: $192,423,000
Total deposits: $176,725,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First Savings and Loan Association of Central Indiana does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First Savings and Loan Association of Central Indiana, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Savings and Loan Association of Central Indiana will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-118

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.