First Security Bank of Brookfield

Missouri – Linn – Brookfield

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

16915

1950

FDIC Certificate Number: 16915
FDIC's unique number: 10999
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Columbia Mo

Federal Reserve ID Number: 639240
Report Date: 1993-03-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1994-08-24

1950-02-16 Institution established. Original name: Citizens Bank Of Brookfield.
1972-01-03 Changed name to First Security Bank Of Brookfield .
1987-08-01 Acquired Bank Of Keytesville in Keytesville, Missouri.
1993-04-26 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Citizens Bank and Trust Company in Chillicothe, Missouri.
1996-11-05 Moved bank headquarters from Brookfield, Missouri to Chillicothe, Missouri.
1998-01-01 Acquired Trenton Trust Company in Trenton, Missouri.
1999-10-13 Acquired Macon Building And Loan Association, F.A. in Macon, Missouri.
2008-08-22 Acquired The Columbian Bank And Trust Company in Topeka, Kansas as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $58,361,000
Total deposits: $53,445,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First Security Bank of Brookfield does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First Security Bank of Brookfield, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Security Bank of Brookfield will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-389

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.