First State Bank

Texas – Taylor – Abilene

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

active

10704

1903

FDIC Certificate Number: 10704
FDIC's unique number: 6867
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Dallas

Federal Reserve ID Number: 498456
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SM

Number of Domestic Offices: 2
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2008-02-04

1903-06-03 Institution established. Original name: The Bevans State Bank Of Menard.
2003-12-31 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Federal Reserve Board.
2003-12-31 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Members Frs.
2004-01-01 Changed name to First State Bank .
2006-11-22 Moved bank headquarters from Menard, Texas to Abilene, Texas.

Total assets: $34,768,000
Total deposits: $31,663,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $31,663,000
Equity capital: $2,970,000

Net income: $66,000

Return on Assets: 0.39
Return on Equity: 4.45
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: Bsa Bankshares, Inc.

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-52

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.