First State Bank Chokio

Minnesota – Stevens – Chokio

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

26831

1986

FDIC Certificate Number: 26831
FDIC's unique number: 36057
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Fargo

Federal Reserve ID Number: 402855
Report Date: 1993-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1993-09-21

1986-11-07 Institution established. Original name: First State Bank Chokio.
1986-11-07 Acquired Chokio State Bank in Chokio, Minnesota.
1993-09-15 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Farmers and Merchants State Bank of Donnelly in Donnelly, Minnesota.
1993-12-13 Changed name to United Farmers & Merchants State Bank .
1994-02-15 Moved bank headquarters from Donnelly, Minnesota to Morris, Minnesota.

Total assets: $10,512,000
Total deposits: $9,594,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First State Bank Chokio does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First State Bank Chokio, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First State Bank Chokio will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-432

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.