First State Bank of Covington, Tennessee

Tennessee – Tipton – Covington

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

9192

1919

FDIC Certificate Number: 9192
FDIC's unique number: 5886
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Memphis

Federal Reserve ID Number: 121558
Report Date: 1999-12-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2000-03-14

1919-01-01 Institution established. Original name: First State Bank Of Covington, Tennessee.
2000-02-12 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Union Planters Bank, National Association in Memphis, Tennessee.
2002-06-21 Acquired Jefferson Heritage Bank in Denton, Texas.
2003-06-09 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of Northwest Tennessee Fsb in Paris, Tennessee.
2004-12-11 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of The Lakeway Area in Morristown, Tennessee.
2005-06-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Regions Bank in Birmingham, Alabama.
2005-09-29 Acquired Regions Morgan Keegan Trust, F.S.B. in Birmingham, Alabama.
2006-11-04 Acquired Amsouth Bank in Birmingham, Alabama.
2007-11-30 Reorganized.
2008-08-29 Acquired Integrity Bank in Alpharetta, Georgia as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-02-06 Acquired Firstbank Financial Services in Mcdonough, Georgia as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $118,136,000
Total deposits: $106,398,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First State Bank of Covington, Tennessee does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First State Bank of Covington, Tennessee, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First State Bank of Covington, Tennessee will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-381

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.