First State Bank of Round Lake

Illinois – Lake – Round Lake

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

16884

1949

FDIC Certificate Number: 16884
FDIC's unique number: 10976
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Chicago

Federal Reserve ID Number: 944841
Report Date: 2005-09-30

Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 2005-11-22

1949-05-07 Institution established. Original name: First State Bank Of Round Lake.
1986-04-30 Reorganized.
2001-01-16 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Federal Reserve Board.
2001-01-16 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Members Frs.
2005-11-11 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Norstates Bank in Waukegan, Illinois.

Total assets: $135,050,000
Total deposits: $110,846,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First State Bank of Round Lake does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First State Bank of Round Lake, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First State Bank of Round Lake will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-148

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.