Firstar Bank Burlington, National Association

Iowa – Des Moines – Burlington

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

15553

1937

FDIC Certificate Number: 15553
FDIC's unique number: 9847
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Cedar Rapids

Federal Reserve ID Number: 796442
Report Date: 1999-06-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 14395
The date of the last data update: 1999-11-24

1937-11-08 Institution established. Original name: First National Bank.
1991-06-03 Changed name to Firstar Bank Burlington, National Association .
1995-11-13 Changed trust powers from Full Trust Powers Granted to Trust Powers Terminated.
1999-09-10 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Firstar Bank, National Association in Cincinnati, Ohio.
1999-09-11 Acquired Firstar Bank Wisconsin in Madison, Wisconsin.
1999-10-15 Acquired Firstar Bank Milwaukee, National Association in Milwaukee, Wisconsin.
1999-10-15 Acquired Firstar Bank Wausau, National Association in Wausau, Wisconsin.
1999-11-12 Acquired Firstar Metropolitan Bank & Trust in Phoenix, Arizona.
2000-03-07 Acquired Mercantile Bank Of Arkansas National Association in North Little Rock, Arkansas.
2000-04-14 Acquired Firstar Bank Kentucky in Paducah, Kentucky.
2000-04-14 Acquired Mercantile Bank Of Illinois in Springfield, Illinois.
2000-05-12 Acquired Mercantile Bank Midwest in Des Moines, Iowa.
2000-08-11 Acquired Firstar Bank Missouri, National Association in Saint Louis, Missouri.
2000-08-11 Acquired Mercantile Trust Company, National Association in St. Louis, Missouri.
2001-07-13 Acquired Firstar Bank, National Association in Overland Park, Kansas.
2001-08-09 Changed name to U.S. Bank National Association .
2001-08-09 Acquired U.S. Bank National Association in Minneapolis, Minnesota.
2001-08-09 Acquired U.S. Bank National Association Or in Canby, Oregon.
2002-01-11 Acquired U.S. Bank National Association Mt in Billings, Montana.
2002-01-11 Acquired U.S. Bank Trust National Association in St. Paul, Minnesota.
2002-01-11 Acquired U.S. Bank Trust National Association in San Francisco, California.
2002-01-11 Acquired U.S. Bank Trust National Association in Seattle, Washington.
2002-01-11 Acquired U.S. Bank Trust National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2002-01-11 Acquired U.S. Bank Trust National Association in Phoenix, Arizona.
2002-01-11 Acquired U. S. Bank Trust, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2005-05-02 Acquired U. S. Bank Trust Interim National Association, Connecticut in Hartford, Connecticut.
2006-09-05 Reorganized.
2006-09-12 Acquired Weststar Bank in Vail, Colorado.
2007-02-06 Acquired Heritagebank in Great Falls, Montana.
2008-06-01 Acquired Mellon 1st Business Bank, National Association in Los Angeles, California.
2008-11-21 Acquired Pff Bank & Trust in Pomona, California as part of a government assisted transaction.
2008-11-21 Acquired Downey Savings And Loan Association, F.A. in Newport Beach, California as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-04-24 Acquired First Bank Of Idaho, Fsb in Ketchum, Idaho as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30 Acquired Park National Bank in Chicago, Illinois as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30 Acquired North Houston Bank in Houston, Texas as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30 Acquired San Diego National Bank in San Diego, California as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30 Acquired Citizens National Bank in Teague, Texas as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30 Acquired Pacific National Bank in San Francisco, California as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30 Acquired Bank Usa, National Association in Phoenix, Arizona as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30 Acquired Madisonville State Bank in Madisonville, Texas as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30 Acquired California National Bank in Los Angeles, California as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30 Acquired Community Bank Of Lemont in Lemont, Illinois as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-01-01 Reorganized.
2011-01-28 Acquired First Community Bank in Taos, New Mexico as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $2,274,000
Total deposits: $0,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Firstar Bank Burlington, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Firstar Bank Burlington, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Firstar Bank Burlington, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-162

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.