Gibraltar Savings

California – Los Angeles – Beverly Hills

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

31629

1886

FDIC Certificate Number: 31629
FDIC's unique number: 44463
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Los Angeles (West)

Federal Reserve ID Number: 502371
Report Date: 1989-09-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1994-07-22

1886-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Gibraltar Savings.
1976-04-30 Acquired Gibraltar Savings And Loan Association in Beverly Hills, California.
1986-08-08 Acquired Presidio Savings And Loan Association, A Federal Savings And Loan Associ in Porterville, California as part of a government assisted transaction.
1987-05-31 Acquired Santa Clara Savings, Federal Savings And Loan Association in Santa Clara, California.
1989-03-31 Entered into a conservatorship.
1989-10-31 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Gibraltar Savings, F.A. in Simi Valley, California.
1990-01-22 Moved bank headquarters from Beverly Hills, California to Simi Valley, California.
1990-06-29 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Security Pacific National Bank in Los Angeles, California.
1990-08-23 Acquired La Jolla Bank & Trust Company in La Jolla, California.
1990-09-21 Acquired Mercury Federal Savings And Loan Association in Huntington Beach, California.
1990-11-15 Acquired Santa Clarita National Bank in Valencia, California.
1991-03-07 Acquired Security Pacific Asian Bank, National Associaton in Los Angeles, California.
1992-04-22 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of America National Trust and Savings Association in San Francisco, California.
1996-07-01 Acquired Bank Of America Oregon in Portland, Oregon.
1996-09-01 Acquired Bankamerica National Trust Company in New York City, New York.
1997-01-01 Acquired Bank Of America Nw, National Association in Seattle, Washington.
1997-01-01 Acquired Bank Of America, National Association in Las Vegas, Nevada.
1997-01-01 Acquired Bank Of America-alaska, National Association in Anchorage, Alaska.
1997-01-01 Acquired Bank Of America Arizona in Phoenix, Arizona.
1997-01-01 Acquired Bank Of America New Mexico, National Association in Albuquerque, New Mexico.
1997-07-01 Acquired Bank Of America Illinois in Chicago, Illinois.
1997-07-01 Acquired Bank Of America Trust Company Of Florida, National Association in Boca Raton, Florida.
1999-07-23 Changed name to Bank Of America, National Association .
1999-07-23 Moved bank headquarters from San Francisco, California to Charlotte, North Carolina.
1999-07-23 Acquired Bank Of America, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
1999-12-01 Acquired Bank Of America Utah, National Association in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2001-05-31 Acquired Nationsbank Trust Company Of New York in New York, New York.
2005-06-13 Acquired Fleet National Bank in Providence, Rhode Island.
2006-09-22 Acquired Mbna America Delaware, National Association in Wilmington, Delaware.
2008-02-22 Acquired United States Trust Company , National Association in New York, New York.
2008-06-30 Acquired Bank Of America Georgia, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank Midwest National Association in Troy, Michigan.
2009-01-16 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
2009-04-27 Acquired Countrywide Bank, Fsb in Centennial, Colorado.
2009-07-01 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank Usa in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2009-11-02 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank & Trust Co., Fsb in New York, New York.

Total assets: $8,223,249,000
Total deposits: $6,905,592,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Gibraltar Savings does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Gibraltar Savings, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Gibraltar Savings will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-19519

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.