Golden Circle Savings Association, FSB

Texas – Navarro – Corsicana

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

32225

1984

FDIC Certificate Number: 32225
FDIC's unique number: 45059
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Dallas

Federal Reserve ID Number: 969170
Report Date: 1990-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1995-02-06

1984-06-11 Institution established. Original name: Golden Circle Savings Association, Fsb.
1989-04-06 Entered into a conservatorship.
1990-08-24 Government conservatorship or bridge bank resolved.
1990-08-24 Ceased operations as a result of a government supervised payoff, liquidation or closing. No active institution received any of deposits.

Total assets: $12,921,000
Total deposits: $14,346,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Golden Circle Savings Association, FSB does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Golden Circle Savings Association, FSB, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Golden Circle Savings Association, FSB will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-172

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.