Golden State Bank, FSB

California – Orange – East Irvine

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

32228

1984

FDIC Certificate Number: 32228
FDIC's unique number: 45062
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Orange

Federal Reserve ID Number: 975171
Report Date: 1993-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1993-10-26

1984-06-21 Institution established. Original name: Westmark Savings Bank.
1987-10-31 Moved bank headquarters from Newport Beach, California to Sherman Oaks, California.
1987-10-31 Changed name to Sherman Oaks Savings Bank, Fsb .
1987-10-31 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1991-05-20 Changed name to Golden State Bank, Fsb .
1991-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from Sherman Oaks, California to Irvine, California.
1993-08-13 Failed, went into receivership, and then became Golden State Federal Savings Bank in Irvine, California.
1994-04-08 Ceased operations as a result of a government supervised payoff, liquidation or closing. No active institution received any of deposits.
1994-04-08 Government conservatorship or bridge bank resolved.

Total assets: $50,629,000
Total deposits: $46,554,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Golden State Bank, FSB does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Golden State Bank, FSB, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Golden State Bank, FSB will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-179

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.