GOLDOME SAVINGS BANK, F.S.B.

Florida – Pinellas – Saint Petersburg

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

31168

1960

FDIC Certificate Number: 31168
FDIC's unique number: 44002
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Tampa

Federal Reserve ID Number: 707774
Report Date: 1991-03-31

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1997-09-17

1960-04-20 Institution established. Original name: Goldome Savings Association.
1984-09-30 Changed organization type to Stock Savings & Loan.
1984-12-31 Acquired Palmetto Federal Savings And Loan Association in Palmetto, Florida.
1989-12-27 Changed name to Goldome Savings Bank, F.S.B. .
1991-05-31 Failed, went into receivership, and then became Goldome Federal Savings Bank in St. Petersburg, Florida.
1994-04-15 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of First of America Bank - Florida, FSB in St. Petersburg, Florida.
1995-01-06 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1995-02-09 Acquired Presidential Bank, F.S.B. in Sarasota, Florida.
1995-02-24 Acquired First Federal Savings Bank Of Charlotte County in Port Charlotte, Florida.
1995-07-24 Moved bank headquarters from St. Petersburg, Florida to Tampa, Florida.
1998-01-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of SouthTrust Bank, National Association in Birmingham, Alabama.
1998-06-19 Acquired American National Bank Of Florida in Jacksonville, Florida.
1998-07-01 Acquired Southtrust Asset Management Company Of Florida, National Association in South Pasadena, Florida.
1998-07-01 Acquired Southtrust Asset Management Company Of Georgia, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
1998-07-01 Acquired Southtrust Estate & Trust Services Of The Carolinas, Inc. in Charlotte, North Carolina.
1998-08-07 Acquired Marine Bank in St. Petersburg, Florida.
1998-10-30 Acquired Securitybank Texas in Arlington, Texas.
1998-11-23 Acquired Georgia National Bank in Athens, Georgia.
1998-12-11 Acquired First American Bank Of Indian River County in Vero Beach, Florida.
1999-03-12 Acquired Langham Creek National Bank in Houston, Texas.
1999-07-30 Acquired Navigation Bank in Houston, Texas.
1999-08-13 Acquired First Bank And Trust in Groves, Texas.
2000-01-14 Acquired Heritage Bank in Waxahachie, Texas.
2000-04-14 Acquired Security National Bank Of San Antonio in San Antonio, Texas.
2000-06-06 Changed name to Southtrust Bank .
2000-06-06 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Members Frs.
2000-06-06 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Reserve Board.
2000-12-15 Acquired First Bank in Tallahassee, Florida.
2001-03-16 Acquired Independent National Bank in Irving, Texas.
2001-03-30 Acquired Bayshore National Bank Of La Porte in La Porte, Texas.
2001-08-03 Acquired Cenit Bank in Norfolk, Virginia.
2001-11-20 Acquired The Bank Of Tidewater in Virginia Beach, Virginia.
2001-11-30 Acquired Commerce Bank in Richmond, Virginia.
2002-03-01 Acquired Landmark Bank in Euless, Texas.
2003-06-20 Acquired Founders National Bank-skillman in Dallas, Texas.
2004-05-14 Acquired Floridafirst Bank in Lakeland, Florida.
2005-01-03 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Wachovia Bank, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
2006-03-01 Acquired Western Financial Bank, National Association in Irvine, California.
2007-10-12 Acquired World Savings Bank Interim, National Association in Oceanside, New York.
2008-06-01 Acquired A.g. Edwards Trust Company, Fsb in St. Louis, Missouri.
2010-03-20 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association in Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
2010-04-10 Acquired Wachovia Card Services, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2010-05-10 Acquired Wells Fargo Hsbc Trade Bank, National Association in San Francisco, California.
2010-11-01 Acquired Wells Fargo Alaska Trust Company, National Association in Anchorage, Alaska.
2011-03-31 Acquired Wells Fargo Central Bank in Calabasas, California.

Total assets: $1,476,880,000
Total deposits: $1,320,508,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

GOLDOME SAVINGS BANK, F.S.B. does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with GOLDOME SAVINGS BANK, F.S.B., we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and GOLDOME SAVINGS BANK, F.S.B. will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-209

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.