Grand Junction U.S. Industrial Bank

Colorado – Mesa – Grand Junction

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

91212

1982

FDIC Certificate Number: 91212
FDIC's unique number: 18264
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Denver

Federal Reserve ID Number: 265854
Report Date: 1986-09-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1982-10-05 Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: Grand Junction U.S. Industrial Bank.
1985-10-25 Became FDIC insured.
1986-10-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Littleton U.S. Industrial Bank in Littleton, Colorado.
1988-06-01 Changed name to American Industrial Bank Of Littleton .
1990-06-13 Changed name to Afba Industrial Bank .
1991-08-05 Moved bank headquarters from Littleton, Colorado to Colorado Springs, Colorado.
2000-10-11 Changed name to 5 Star Bank .
2009-05-01 Changed organization type to Commercial Bank.
2009-05-01 Changed name to 5star Bank .

Total assets: $2,187,000
Total deposits: $905,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Grand Junction U.S. Industrial Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Grand Junction U.S. Industrial Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Grand Junction U.S. Industrial Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-253

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.