Granite Bank

New Hampshire – Hillsborough – Amherst

(SB) Savings banks, state charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SB) Savings banks, state charter

inactive

27004

1987

FDIC Certificate Number: 27004
FDIC's unique number: 36436
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord

Federal Reserve ID Number: 1164936
Report Date: 1989-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SB
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1987-07-13 Institution established. Original name: Granite Bank.
1989-07-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Granite Bank, National Association in Peterborough, New Hampshire.
1990-03-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Granite Bank in Keene, New Hampshire.
1991-08-02 Acquired First Northern Co-operative Bank, A Federal Savings Bank in Keene, New Hampshire as part of a government assisted transaction.
1991-11-15 Acquired Durham Trust Company in Durham, New Hampshire.
1992-09-28 Changed trust powers from Full Trust Powers Granted to Trust Powers Terminated.
1997-11-01 Acquired Primary Bank in Peterborough, New Hampshire.
2004-05-28 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Ocean National Bank in Kennebunk, Maine.
2004-10-12 Moved bank headquarters from Keene, New Hampshire to Portsmouth, New Hampshire.
2007-06-29 Changed name to Ocean Bank .
2007-06-29 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Not Members Of The Frs.
2007-06-29 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
2007-11-01 Acquired Community Bank And Trust Company in Wolfeboro, New Hampshire.
2008-01-01 Changed institution class to Occ Supervised Savings Banks.
2008-01-01 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
2008-01-01 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Office Of Thrift Supervision.
2009-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of People's United Bank in Bridgeport, Connecticut.
2010-04-16 Acquired Butler Bank in Lowell, Massachusetts as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-11-30 Acquired Bank Of Smithtown in Smithtown, New York.
2010-11-30 Acquired Riverbank in North Andover, Massachusetts.
2011-07-01 Acquired Danversbank in Danvers, Massachusetts.

Total assets: $19,510,000
Total deposits: $17,050,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Granite Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Granite Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Granite Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-487

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.