Greater Atlantic Bank

Virginia – Fairfax – Reston

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

32583

1887

FDIC Certificate Number: 32583
FDIC's unique number: 45417
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Richmond

Federal Reserve ID Number: 633976
Report Date: 2009-09-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 2009-12-07

1887-05-27 Institution established. Original name: Greater Baltimore Savings And Loan Association.
1989-05-31 Changed name to Greater Atlantic Savings Bank, F.S.B. .
1989-05-31 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1991-09-19 Moved bank headquarters from Baltimore, Maryland to Rockville, Maryland.
1998-04-20 Changed name to Greater Atlantic Bank .
1999-09-23 Moved bank headquarters from Rockville, Maryland to Reston, Virginia.
2000-08-24 Acquired Dominion Savings Bank, F.S.B. in Front Royal, Virginia.
2009-12-04 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of SONABANK in Mclean, Virginia.
2009-12-04 FDIC closing information for Greater Atlantic Bank : http://www.fdic.gov/bank/individual/failed/atlantic-va.html.

Total assets: $203,262,000
Total deposits: $179,248,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Greater Atlantic Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Greater Atlantic Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Greater Atlantic Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-496

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.