Guaranty National Bank of Tallahassee

Florida – Leon – Tallahassee

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 2.28 ] – questionable Voters 1   Comments 1

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

26838

1986

FDIC Certificate Number: 26838
FDIC's unique number: 36064
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Gainesville

Federal Reserve ID Number: 316738
Report Date: 2003-12-31

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 21162
The date of the last data update: 2004-03-17

1986-11-17 Institution established. Original name: Guaranty National Bank Of Tallahassee.
2004-03-12 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Hancock Bank of Florida in Tallahassee, Florida.
2004-03-12 FDIC closing information for Guaranty National Bank Of Tallahassee : http://www.fdic.gov/bank/individual/failed/gnb.html.
2008-02-08 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
2010-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Hancock Bank in Gulfport, Mississippi.

Total assets: $71,280,000
Total deposits: $65,614,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Guaranty National Bank of Tallahassee has received 1 rating(s) and 1 review(s), resulting in an average rating of 2.28 on a scale from 1 to 5. The overall rating for this bank is questionable.

If you have personal experience with Guaranty National Bank of Tallahassee, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Guaranty National Bank of Tallahassee will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Simo

Really wonderful and iftmroanive post.Thanks for sharing your thoughts.Web designers often make mistakes of all kinds during the process of web design and development. Wrong can easily cost thousands of customers.For a website to really work for your business,you have to avoid common web design mistakes mentioned above. Thanks!! AKS Websoft

Was this review helpful to you?

Rate your satisfaction with services and products
Rate on-line access
Do you trust this financial institution?
Rate their support/assistance
Banking fees and charges
How convenient is access to their products and services?
How competitive their rates are?

0     0    


     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-435

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.