Hawkeye Bank and Trust

Iowa – Clinton – Camanche

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

18898

1963

FDIC Certificate Number: 18898
FDIC's unique number: 12747
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Cedar Rapids

Federal Reserve ID Number: 181646
Report Date: 1987-03-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1963-10-01 Institution established. Original name: Camanche State Bank.
1983-04-01 Changed name to Hawkeye Bank And Trust .
1987-04-10 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Clinton National Bank in Clinton, Iowa.

Total assets: $10,631,000
Total deposits: $9,731,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Hawkeye Bank and Trust does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Hawkeye Bank and Trust, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Hawkeye Bank and Trust will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-292

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.